Burgett v. Kansas City Area Transportation Authority et al

Defendant: Kansas City Area Transportation Authority, Virgil Lienhard, Shelia Porter, Kansas City Board of Police Commissioners, Brent Cartwright, Patrick McInerney, Alvin Brooks, Angela Wasson-Hunt, Lisa Pelofsky and Sly James
Plaintiff: Charles L Burgett
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00494
Filed: May 17, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Western District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Ortrie D. Smith
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION GRANTING DEFENDANT KANSAS CITY AREA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY'S MOTION TO DISMISS 7 entered by Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes, Renea)
December 13, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by Judge Ortrie Smith (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; (2) DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS BROOKS, JAMES, PELOFSKY, WASSONHUNT, AND RADER'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AND (3) DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS PORTER AND LIENHARD'S MOTION TO DISMISS. 44 , 49 . (Order mailed to Charles Burgett) (Matthes, Renea)
December 13, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION ENTERED BY JUDGE ORTRIE SMITH (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE; (2)DISMISSING COUNTS I, II, AND III WITH RESPECT TO KCATA; AND (3) GRANTING DEFENDANT KANSAS CITY AREA TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY'S MOTIONFOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO ANY REMAINING CLAIMS 17 . (Order mailed to Charles Burgett) (Matthes, Renea)
February 19, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion to Dismiss. The Court dismisses Cartwright from Counts I, II, and III. The Court also dismisses Count IV in its entirety. Thus, Defendants Brooks, James, Pelofsky, Wasson-Hunt, Rader are dismissed from this case in both their individual and official capacities. Signed on 2/19/14 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Order mailed to Plaintiff.) (Matthes, Renea)
February 26, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court dismisses Porter and Lienhard from Counts I, II, III, and VII, and dismisses KCATA from Counts V and VII. Accordingly, KCATA, Porter, and Lienhardare dismissed from this case. Signed on 2/26/14 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes, Renea) Modified on 2/26/2014 to reflect that a copy of the order was mailed to Charles L Burgett PO Box 24826 Kansas City, MO 64131. Per request of the Court.(Travis, Kendra).
February 26, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER IMPOSING COST OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SHELIA PORTER 64 . Signed on 2/26/14 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes, Renea)
July 11, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by Judge Ortrie D. Smith. Defendant Kansas City Board of Police Commissioners' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 4)is granted. (Order mailed to Plaintiff.) (Matthes, Renea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Burgett v. Kansas City Area Transportation Authority et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Area Transportation Authority
Represented By: Chad Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgil Lienhard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelia Porter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Board of Police Commissioners
Represented By: Jase C Carter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Cartwright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick McInerney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Brooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Wasson-Hunt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Pelofsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sly James
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles L Burgett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]