Wingo v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Jared Wingo
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
 
Case Number: 6:2013cv03097
Filed: March 8, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Western District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Richard E. Dorr
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 defendant's expedited motion to reopen case and for order staying effect of Court's Remand Order and 31 defendant's Rule 59(e) expedited motion for reconsideration of order of remand. Case shall be reopened. All motions previously denied as moot 14 and 20 shall be considered re-opened; and the Court will reexamine those motions in the near future. Signed on 7/25/13 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
August 8, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - denying 14 plaintiff's MOTION to voluntarily dismiss case. Suggestions in opposition/response to #20, defendant's motion to dismiss now due 8/19/2013 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 8/8/13 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
October 8, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed on 10/8/13 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wingo v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Wingo
Represented By: David L. Steelman
Represented By: Thomas H. Hearne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Monte P. Clithero
Represented By: Joseph A Cancila, Jr
Represented By: Heidi Dalenberg
Represented By: Lance Roskens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]