Holtshouser et al v. United States of America,

Defendant: United States of America,
Plaintiff: Harold Holtshouser and Kathy Holtshouser
Case Number: 1:2011cv00114
Filed: September 30, 2011
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Billings Office
County: PARK
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Cebull
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 4/1/2013. (see order for specifics) (CAA, )
April 1, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 4/1/2013. (see Order for specifics) (CAA, )
April 10, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Plaintiffs Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Physician Testimony. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 4/10/2013. (EMA)
May 1, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW and ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall enter Judgment in favor of Defendant USA, Dismissing Plaintiffs' Claims With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 5/1/2013. (EMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holtshouser et al v. United States of America,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Holtshouser
Represented By: Daniel B. Bidegaray
Represented By: Anna Bidegaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Holtshouser
Represented By: Anna Bidegaray
Represented By: Daniel B. Bidegaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.