Kelley v. Billings Clinic et al

Plaintiff: Mark J. Kelley
Defendant: Billings Clinic
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00074
Filed: June 20, 2012
 
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Cebull
Referring Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
 
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Compel; Billings Clinic's request for attorneys' fees is denied. Signed by Magistrate Carolyn S Ostby on 4/8/2013. (JDH, )
June 3, 2013 59 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Quash; GRANTED insofar as it addresses the subpoena issued on 3/25/2013; DENIED insofar as it addresses the subpoena issued on 4/15/2013. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS.) Signed by Magistrate Carolyn S Ostby on 6/3/2013. (JDH, )
January 21, 2014 76 Featured Case ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's 71 MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Disputed Issues is GRANTED. It is recommended 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Billings Clinic, be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Magistrate Carolyn S Ostby on 1/21/2014. (JDH, )
February 6, 2014 79 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part, and DENIED, as set forth in Judge Ostby's Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/6/2014. (ACL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kelley v. Billings Clinic et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark J. Kelley
Represented By: Daniel Gregory Gillispie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billings Clinic
Represented By: Edward John Butler
Represented By: Karl J. Englund
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]