Giard et al v. Ouellette et al

Plaintiff: Homer L. Giard and Mary Giard
Defendant: Brett Ouellette and Burlington Northern and Santa Fe Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv00113
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Billings Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Cebull
Referring Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is recommended 6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Brett Ouellette be GRANTED; and 8 MOTION to Remand filed by Mary Giard and Homer L. Giard be DENIED. Objections to F&R due by 11/19/2012 Signed by Magistrate Carolyn S Ostby on 11/1/2012. (JDH, ) Modified on 11/1/2012 to change document type to an Opinion (JDH, ).
March 4, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 6 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Brett Ouellette, 23 Findings and Recommendations, 8 Motion to Remand filed by Mary Giard, Homer L. Giard. ; granting 6 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 8 Motion to Remand; adopting Findings and Recommendations re 23 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 3/4/2013. (CAA, )
January 6, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plantiff's Motion to Strike 37 is GRANTED, FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Burlington Northern and Santa Fe Railway Company. RECOMMENDED that the Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED, Homer Giard's claim against BNSF be DISMISSED, and Mary Giard's loss of consortium claim be DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Carolyn S Ostby on 1/6/2014. (CLR)
January 27, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; GRANTING 30 Motion for Summary Judgment; DISMISSING Plaintiff Homer Giard's claim against BNSF and DISMISSING Plaintiff Mary Giard's loss of consortium claim against BNSF. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/27/2014. (ACL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giard et al v. Ouellette et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homer L. Giard
Represented By: Joseph P. Cosgrove
Represented By: Alexander Blewett, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Giard
Represented By: Joseph P. Cosgrove
Represented By: Alexander Blewett, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Ouellette
Represented By: Randy J. Cox
Represented By: Thomas J. Leonard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Northern and Santa Fe Railway Company
Represented By: Randy J. Cox
Represented By: Thomas J. Leonard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]