Willink v. Boyne USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: John Willink
Defendant: Boyne USA, Inc. and I-V Does
Case Number: 2:2012cv00074
Filed: October 29, 2012
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Butte Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings regarding Count II of Plaintiff's complaint. Count II is DISMISSED. Defendant's request for attorney's fees is DENIED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/29/2013. (dle)
October 23, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/23/2013. (dle)
December 17, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/17/2013. (dle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willink v. Boyne USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Willink
Represented By: Daniel B. Bidegaray
Represented By: Anna Bidegaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyne USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ian McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I-V Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.