Jerome v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Wendy J. Jerome
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 4:2009cv00020
Filed: March 5, 2009
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Great Falls Office
County: CASCADE
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Referring Judge: Keith Strong
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael J. Astrue, 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wendy J. Jerome Objections to F&R due by 11/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Keith Strong on 11/12/2009. (SLL, )
December 7, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 21 Findings and Recommendations. 1) Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 11 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as addressed in Judge Strong's Findings and Recommendations filed 11/12 /09. 2) Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 14 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as addressed in Judge Strong's Findings and Recommendations filed 11/12/09. 3) The case is REMANDED to the ALJ for consideration of the issues raised by the Findings and Recommendations of Magistrate Strong. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/7/2009. (SLR, ) Modified on 12/7/2009 to insert links to Mtns for SJ. (SLR, ).
March 16, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff's 25 Application for Award of EAJA Fees and Costs is DENIED without prejudice to renewal if plaintiff prevails on the merits of her claim. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/16/2010. (ACC, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerome v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy J. Jerome
Represented By: John E. Seidlitz, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]