Alliance for the Wild Rockies et al v. Cottrell et al

Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies and Native Ecosystems Council
Defendant: Jane L. Cottrell and United States Forest Service
Case Number: 9:2009cv00107
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a preliminary injunction is entered regarding the Rat Creek Salvage Project; Defendants are ENJOINED from proceeding with the Rat Creek Salvage Project re 34 USCA Order. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/25/2010. (BAW, )
August 4, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying this Court's June 25, 2010 preliminary injunction as per 37 USCA Order. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/4/2010. (BAW, )
August 3, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 motion to dissolve preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/3/2011. (TPG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance for the Wild Rockies et al v. Cottrell et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native Ecosystems Council
Represented By: Susan Jane M. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane L. Cottrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]