McClanahan v. State of Montana et al

Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Montana and State of Montana
Petitioner: Shane McClanahan
 
Case Number: 9:2011cv00092
Filed: June 24, 2011
 
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: XX out of state
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
 
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2012 38 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 36 in full. McClanahan's second, fourth, and sixth claims are DENIED in their entirety. McClanahan's first claim is DENIED as to the statements made to Detective Newlon, and his fifth claim is DENIED as to cases DC-01-422 and CV ll-92-M. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/12/2012. Mailed to McClanahan. (TAG, )
June 23, 2011 3 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER FOR TRANSFER by Chief Judge Bruce D. Black transferring this case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Montana. Terminated document(s): 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Related document(s): 1 Motion for 2254 Relief. (an) [Transferred from nmd on 6/24/2011.]
February 25, 2013 58 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 57 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full. McClanahan's first, third, and fifth claims are DENIED. Respondents' Motion to Dismiss 49 is DISMISSED AS MOOT. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/25/2013. Mailed to McClanahan. (TAG, )
August 23, 2013 65 Featured Case ORDER. McClanahan's first, third, and fifth claims are DENIED. Respondents' Motion to Dismiss 49 is DISMISSED AS MOOT. McClanahan's Petition 8 is DENIED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/23/2013. Mailed to McClanahan. (TAG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McClanahan v. State of Montana et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Montana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Montana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shane McClanahan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]