Edmundson v. Flathead County Sheriff Depatment et al

Defendant: Tammy, Flathead County Sheriff Depatment and Doctor Dusing
Plaintiff: Rodney A. Edmundson
Case Number: 9:2013cv00032
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: FLATHEAD
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 8 in full. All claims against Dr. Dusing and the Flathead County Sheriff's Department are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All claims against Nurse Tammy except those arising from her alleged denial of Tylenol on June 14 and 15, 2012, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/3/2014. Mailed to Christensen. (TAG, )
January 29, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion for Transcript. Edmundson's appeal was not taken in good faith and he should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/29/2014. Mailed to Edmundson and USCA. (TAG, )
February 5, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Edmundson's "Motion to Object to Magistrate's Order denying Appointment of Counsel" 24 is denied. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 2/5/2014. Mailed to Edmundson. (TAG, )
August 18, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Defendant's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Compel is DENIED. The Court certifies that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 8/18/2014. Mailed to Edmundson. (TAG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmundson v. Flathead County Sheriff Depatment et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flathead County Sheriff Depatment
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Dusing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney A. Edmundson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]