Guillen et al v. Callaghan et al

Defendant: Boby Backer, Patrick Shanon and Courtney Callaghan
Plaintiff: Alberto Guillen
 
Case Number: 9:2013cv00048
Filed: February 14, 2013
 
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/31/2013. Mailed to Guillen. (TAG, )
January 6, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 16 in full. Claims against Defendants Baker, Community Medical Center, and the Montana Department of Child and Family Services asserted in Guillen's Amended Complaint, 7 , are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/6/2014. Mailed to Guillen. (TAG, )
April 2, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court Plaintiff's Objection 38 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 4/2/2014. Mailed to Guillen, (TAG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Guillen et al v. Callaghan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boby Backer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Shanon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Callaghan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Guillen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]