Culp v. Archer-Daniels-Midlands Company et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Culp
Defendant: Archer-Daniels-Midland Company and Jacobs Field Services North America, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2008cv03197
Filed: September 19, 2008
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Torts to Land Office
County: Platte
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: David L. Piester
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. (1)The following matter previously scheduled before the undersigned is herewith referred to Judge Zwart, to wit,(A)Nature of hearing:Pretrial conference.(B)Date and time of hearing: Wednesday, November 10, 2010, at 10:00 a.m.(C)Place of hearin g: Judge Zwart's chambers, Room 566, United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall, North, Lincoln, Nebraska.(2)Judge Zwart will issue a report and recommendation or order as is appropriate. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
March 9, 2010 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 122 Stipulation. The cross-claim filed herein by Archer against Fagen (filing 93 ) and the cross-claim filed herein by Fagen against Archer (filing 108 ) are dismissed without prejudice. With regard to these cross-claims, each party shall pay its own costs. The other claims filed by parties in this action remain pending. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
May 6, 2010 153 Opinion or Order of the Court SETTLEMENT ORDER. It is ordered that: (1)By July 19, 2010, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court (and provide a copy to the magistrate judge and to United States Distr ict Judge Richard G. Kopf, the trial judge to whom this case is assigned), together with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case;(2)Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice;(3)This case is removed from the court's trial docket upon representation by the parties that the case has settled. ***Set Dismissal Papers Deadline -- due by 7/19/2010. Termed 11/10/2010 Pretrial Conference and 11/29/2010 trial date. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
January 12, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 21 Unopposed MOTION to Extend time to respond to MOTION for Summary Judgment 18 . IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's motion (filing 21 ) requesting additional time in which to respond to Archer-Daniels-Midlands Company's motion for summary judgment (filing 18 ) is granted; Plaintiff shall file his responsive brief and any evidentiary materials on or before January 27, 2009. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LKH)
February 2, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant Archer-Daniels-Midlands Company's motion (filings 27 , 29 ) requesting additional time in which to reply to Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (filing 25 ) is granted; Defendant Archer-Daniels-Midlands Company shall file its responsive brief and any evidentiary materials on or before February 6, 2009. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
April 17, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-This matter is before the court on Defendant Archer-Daniels-Midlands Company's (ADM) motion for summary judgment (filing 18 ). The question before the court is whether ADM is considered Plaintiff's statutory employer u nder Neb. Rev. Stat § 48-116 of the Nebraska Workers Compensation Act. See Neb. Rev. Stat § 48-101, et seq.. For the reasons set forth below, the court concludes that ADM is not Plaintiff's statutory employer. IT IS ORDERED that ADM's motion for summary judgment (filing 18 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LKH)
June 22, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 48 Motion for Leave. IT IS ORDERED: 1) The plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file an amended complaint, (Filing No. 48 ), is granted. 2) The plaintiff's amended complaint, a copy of which is attached to his motion, shall be filed on or before June 29, 2009. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LKH)
July 2, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that ADM's motion to amend and certify the court's April 17, 2007 memorandum and order for interlocutory review and to stay the proceeding pending appeal 41 is denied as ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (SED)
July 2, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The plaintiff's unopposed motion to amend the scheduling order 52 is granted. On or before 8/28/09 the parties shall jointly file a motion setting forth their proposed deadlines for continued progression of this case to t rial, including deadlines for serving mandatory disclosures, disclosing experts and their reports, and for completion of discovery, along with a statement of when the case will be ready for trial. The planning conference scheduled before Magistrate J udge Piester on 9/29/09 is cancelled. Counsel for the plaintiff shall promptly forward a copy of this order to counsel for Stainless Fabrication, Inc. and shall file a certificate in the court's record stating he has done so as order by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Case Management Deadline set for 8/28/2009.) (SED)
August 26, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - 1) The plaintiff's anticipated motion to file an amended complaint to add a defendant shall be filed on or before September 8, 2009. 2) The parties' joint oral motion to continue the August 28, 2009 deadline for filin g their joint motion for a scheduling order, (see filing no. 54 ), is granted. Once the anticipated new defendant has responded to the plaintiff's complaint, a new deadline will be set by order of the court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
September 11, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, (filing no. 63 ), is granted. The plaintiff's second amended complaint, a copy of which is attached to the plaintiff's motion, shal l be filed on or before September 18, 2009, and the plaintiff shall promptly effectuate service on the new defendant, Stainless Fabrication, Inc. On or before October 29, 2009, the parties shall jointly file a motion setting forth their proposed dea dlines for continued progression of this case to trial, including deadlines for serving mandatory disclosures, disclosing experts and their reports, and for completion of discovery, along with a statement of when the case will be ready for trial. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
November 3, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motion to withdraw as counsel for defendant, Jacobs Field Services North America, Inc. ("Jacobs"), (filing no. 86 ), filed by Stephen G. Olson, II and the law firm of Engles, Ketcham, Olson & Keith, P.C, is grant ed. Attorney Tim B. Streff remains counsel of record for defendant Jacobs. The plaintiff has moved to strike Archer-Daniels-Midland Company's ("ADM") motion to file a cross-claim against Jacobs because the law firm of Engles, Ketcham, Olson & Keith, P.C. represented both ADM and Jacobs in this case. Filing No. 87 . On or before November 10, 2009, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a statement clarifying whether its objection, (filing no. 87 ), is withdrawn or moot in light of the withdrawal of Stephen G. Olson, II and the law firm of Engles, Ketcham, Olson & Keith, P.C, as counsel for Jacobs. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
November 16, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiffs motion to withdraw, (filing no. 91 ), is granted, and the plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Motion for Leave to File Cross Claims, (filing no. 87 ), is denied as moot. Defendant Archer-Daniels-Midland Compa ny's motion to file an Amended Answer to Second Amended Complaint and Cross Claims, (filing no. 81 ), is granted. On or before November 20, 2009, defendant Archer-Daniels-Midland Company shall file its Amended Answer to Second Amended Complaint and Cross Claims, a copy of which is attached to its motion. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Culp v. Archer-Daniels-Midlands Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Culp
Represented By: Jerold V. Fennell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Field Services North America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]