Jetz Midwest v. Kaplan Educational Centers

Defendant: Kaplan Educational Centers
Plaintiff: Jetz Midwest
Case Number: 4:2009cv03000
Filed: January 2, 2009
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Lancaster
Referring Judge: David L. Piester
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 21 Motion for Leave. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's unopposed motion to file amended complaint, filing no. 21 , is granted and the amended complaint shall be filed forthwith. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (LKH)
July 23, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On or before August 3, 2009, and if defendant's responses to plaintiff's written discovery are incomplete or the interrogatory answers remain unverified as of that date, the plaintiff shall file a supplemental motion to compel. Absent such a motion, the court will deem the discovery issues raised by plaintiffs motion to compel resolved. On or before August 3, 2009, the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's request for attorney fees and expenses and supporting evidence. No reply shall be filed absent leave of the court for good cause shown. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
August 5, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motion to withdraw, (filing no. 43 ) filed by Paul T. Barta, is granted. Patrick J. Barrett and Luke J. Klinker of the Fraser, Stryker Law Firm remain counsel of record for the defendant. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
August 6, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendant's response to plaintiff's motion to compel, (filing no. 39 ), shall be filed on or before August 13, 2009. No reply shall be filed absent leave of the court for good cause shown. The plaintiff's r esponse to defendant's motion to compel plaintiff's participation in alternative dispute resolution and for a stay of discovery, (filing no. 45 ), shall be filed on or before August 13, 2009. No reply shall be filed absent leave of the court for good cause shown. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
August 17, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 45 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's objection, (filing no. 47 ), is granted, and defendant's Motion to Compel Alternative Dispute Resolution and Motion to Stay, (filing no. 45 ), is denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
August 19, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to compel, (filing no. 26 ), and supplemental motion to compel, (filing no. 39 ), are granted, in part, and denied, in part, as stated. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
September 10, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting 51 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. This action is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jetz Midwest v. Kaplan Educational Centers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaplan Educational Centers
Represented By: Patrick J. Barrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jetz Midwest
Represented By: Tiernan T. Siems
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]