Bamford, Inc. v. Poston et al

Defendant: Richard Poston and Ponderosa Partners
Plaintiff: Bamford, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv03035
Filed: February 16, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: Negotiable Instrument Office
County: Buffalo
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: David L. Piester
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1446 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2009 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Change Place of Trial to the North Platte Division. Defendant's request for trial in Lincoln, filing no. 3 , is denied. Trial will be held in North Platte, Nebraska and the case calendared accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (JAB)
April 1, 2009 16 Featured Case ORDER regarding Attorney Jeffrey L. Orr. On or before April 15, 2009 attorney Jeffrey L. Orr shall register for the System or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (JAB)
June 11, 2009 27 Featured Case CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge David L. Piester for final disposition. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
January 25, 2010 53 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The plaintiff's motion to amend the pretrial order, (filing no. 48 ), is granted, and the defendants' objection to that motion, (filing no. 50 ), is denied. The plaintiff's motion to continue the trial, (filin g no. 47 ), is granted, and the defendant's objection to a trial continuance, (filing no. 49 ), is denied. Subject to the prior setting of any civil or criminal case, the non-jury trial of this case, scheduled for one day only, is continued an d will commence at 9:00 a.m. on March 12, 2010. If the parties are submitting any testimony by deposition for this trial, the deposition transcripts shall be promptly forwarded upon receipt to the presiding judge by email sent to kopf@ned.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
March 15, 2010 61 Featured Case JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the oral findings of fact and conclusions of law made as required by Rule 52 and recited on the record at the close of the non-jury trial on March 12, 2010, IT IS ORDERED that judgment is entered for Defendants Richard Poston a nd Ponderosa Partners, a Nebraska General Partnership, and against Plaintiff Bamford, Inc., a Nebraska Corporation, providing that Plaintiff shall take nothing and this case is dismissed with prejudice. Taxable costs are assessed to Plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
May 3, 2010 69 Featured Case ORDER directing counsel to withdraw exhibits offered at trial and if counsel fail to withdraw exhibits from the clerk's office or show cause why exhibits should not be destroyed, the clerk is directed to destroy the exhibits without further notice. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (CCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bamford, Inc. v. Poston et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Poston
Represented By: Craig C. Dirrim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ponderosa Partners
Represented By: Craig C. Dirrim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bamford, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Orr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]