Miller v. State of Nebraska Department of Economic Development et al

Plaintiff: David E. Miller
Defendant: State of Nebraska Department of Economic Development, Richard Baier, Gary Hamer, Steve Charleston and Don Fertig
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv03098
Filed: May 14, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
County: Lancaster
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 29:2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2009 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Motion to Amend Answer. Defendants are given until and including September 15, 2009 to file and serve the amended answer. Any reply to the Amended Answer shall be filed and served within the time allowed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
December 16, 2010 47 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 46 Joint Motion to Extend. Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2011 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 6/21/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
February 15, 2011 65 Featured Case SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 64 the Joint Motion to Extend. Deposition deadline set for 3/28/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2011 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Miller v. State of Nebraska Department of Economic Development et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Miller
Represented By: V. Gene Summerlin, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska Department of Economic Development
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Baier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hamer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Charleston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Fertig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]