Malone

Plaintiff: John Malone
Receiver: James Beckmann
Defendant: General Dynamics Armament and Technical Products, OMAHA HOUSING AUTHORITY, Brad ULRICK, DEBRA LINGWALL, BRAD ASHFORD, GEORGE ACHOLA, WILLIAM BEGLEY, BOB FIDONE and Michelle A. Peters
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv03208
Filed: October 7, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
County: Lancaster
Presiding Judge:
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is before the court on its own motion. The Clerk of the court is directed to unseal the Complaint (filing no. 1 ), the United States's Notice of Election to Decline Intervention (filing no. 26 ), and this Mem orandum and Order. All other documents shall remain under seal. Future filings in this matter shall not be sealed without leave of court. The Clerk of the court is further directed to maintain the United States of America as an interested party in this matter such that the United States of America shall receive electronic notice of all documents filed in this matter. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
August 26, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Clerk of the court send to Plaintiff eight (8) blank summons forms for service on Defendants. Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 4 requires service of a complaint on a defendant within 120 days of filing the complaint. However, because of t he delay in the United States's determination regarding intervention, Plaintiff is granted, on the court's own motion, an extension of time until 60 days from the date of this order to complete service of process. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: October 25, 2010: deadline for Plaintiff to complete service of process. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
April 14, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (filing nos. 40 , 42 , 44 , 48 , and 50 ) are granted, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff's False Claim Act claim (count I of the Com plaint) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's retaliation and tortious interference with contractual relationships claims (counts II and III of the Complaint) are dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Malone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Malone
Represented By: James L. Beckmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: James Beckmann
Represented By: James L. Beckmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Armament and Technical Products
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMAHA HOUSING AUTHORITY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad ULRICK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA LINGWALL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAD ASHFORD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE ACHOLA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM BEGLEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOB FIDONE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle A. Peters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]