Microsoft Corporation v. Pantherpro, Inc. et al

Defendant: Kevin C. Knudson and Pantherpro, Inc.
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 4:2010cv03118
Filed: June 21, 2010
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Counsel for Pantherpro, Inc. shall file the Corporate Disclosure Statement on or before August 4, 2010 or show cause by written affidavit why they cannot comply with the rules of the court. Show Cause Deadline set for 8/4/2010.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
April 25, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court SETTLEMENT ORDER. It is ordered that:(1)Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court (and provide a copy to the ma gistrate judge and to United States District Judge Richard G. Kopf, the trial judge to whom this case is assigned), together with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case;(2)Absent compliance with this order, t his case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice;(3)This case is removed from the court's trial docket upon representation by the parties that the case has settled.***Set Dismissal Papers Deadline -- due by 5/25/2011.Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
May 25, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Extend. The parties shall have until June 8, 2011, to file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the Clerk of Court (and provide a copy to the Magistrate Judge and to the United States District Judge Richard G. Kopf, the trial judge to whom this case is assigned), together with submitting to the trial judge a draft Order which will fully dispose of the case. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. Pantherpro, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin C. Knudson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pantherpro, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Richard P. Jeffries
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]