Welch v. Wagner et al

Defendant: Officer Duffy, Officer Wagner and Dodge County
Plaintiff: Deandra C. Welch
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv03160
Filed: September 23, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This action is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party at last known address) (TEL)
November 21, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Deandra C. Welch shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $51.40 by 12/21/2011, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 12/21/2011: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (Copy mailed to Saunders County Corrections as directed) (TEL)
January 17, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until February 17, 2012, to apprise the court of his current address, in the absence of which this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. (Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 2/17/2012: deadline for informing court of new address) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Welch v. Wagner et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Duffy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Wagner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodge County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandra C. Welch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]