Brown v. Brody et al

Defendant: Detective Chad Kavars, Kirstin Brody and Obie Dortch
Plaintiff: Cornelius Brown
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv03217
Filed: November 30, 2011
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (filing no. 10 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
February 29, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is permitted leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $8.04 by March 27, 2012, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. After pa yment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiffs institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution and to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(AOA)
August 8, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration (filing no. 22 ), liberally construed as a Motion for Relief Under Rule 60(b), is denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
December 5, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint on or before January 3, 2012. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: January 3, 2012: deadline for payment or filing of IFP application. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed as directed with forms to pro se party) (AOA)
December 21, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (filing no. 5 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $8.04 by January 20, 2012, unless an enlargement of time is granted in r esponse to a written motion. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution and set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 20, 2012: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed as directed and to pro se party)(AOA)
January 10, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Complaint (filing no. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown v. Brody et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Chad Kavars
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstin Brody
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obie Dortch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]