Voter v. Barker

Defendant: C.W Barker
Plaintiff: Ronald Voter
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv03002
Filed: January 4, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Clerk of the court is directed to re-open this matter. Plaintiff's monetary damages claim against Barker in her official capacity only is dismissed without prejudice in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff's First Amendment and Sixth Amendment claims for injunctive relief against Barker in her official capacity only may proceed. To obtain service of process on Barker in her official capacity, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons form which the Clerk of the court will provide. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the court. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the Clerk of the court will sig n the summons form, to be forwarded with a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. The Marshal shall serve the summons and the Complaint without payment of costs or fees. The Clerk of the court will copy the Complaint (Filing No. 1 ) and Plaintiff does not need to do so. Plaintiff is granted, on the court's own motion, an extension of time until 120 days from the date of this order to complete service of process. Plaintiff is hereby noti fied that failure to obtain service of process on a defendant within 120 days of the date of this order may result in dismissal of this matter without further notice as to such defendant. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 10 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party with Summons Form and USM-285 Form as directed) ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: (Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 9/13/2012: Check for completion of service of summons) (TEL)
July 19, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (Filing No. 14 ) is granted to the extent that the Complaint is amended to assert claims for injunctive relief and monetary relief against Defendant in her individual capacity. Plaintiff's claims for monetary relief against Defendant in her official capacity remain dismissed. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Injunction (Filing No. 14 ) is denied in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Defendant's Objection (Filing No. 17 ) is granted. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
August 14, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion to Strike. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
February 5, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 29 ) is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
February 19, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: The final pretrial conference in this matter, currently scheduled for February 21, 2013, is cancelled. The conference may be rescheduled after the resolution of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk's office is directed to cancel the final pretrial conference in this matter, currently scheduled for February 21, 2013. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
May 15, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's letter, which the court liberally construes as a motion for relief from judgment, is denied without prejudice to reassertion (Filing No. 34 .). The clerk's office is directed to send to Plaintiff a civil notice of appeal form and the affidavit accompanying a motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party with Forms)(TCL )
February 13, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Ronald Voter shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $10.57 by 3/12/2012, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 3/12/2012: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)
March 22, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the court's filing fee and for failure to comply with a court order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (TEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Voter v. Barker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.W Barker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Voter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]