Madden v. Antonov et al

Plaintiff: Ronald D. Madden
Defendant: Anton Antonov and AV Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv03090
Filed: May 4, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot plaintiff's motion to lift stay 95 . The six-month mandatory stay imposed pursuant to Section 631.67, Florida Statutes has expired. This case is no longer stayed by operation of law. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
May 27, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Attorney Donald DAntuono has a pending case in this court and has not paid the 2013/2014 Attorney Assessment. Within 30 days from the date of this order, Mr. DAntuono is directed to pay the $20.00 fee or show cause why he is unable to do so. Show Cause Deadline set for 6/26/2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (MTB)
June 4, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The plaintiff's motion to continue, (Filing No. 131), is granted. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to BNSF's Motion for Protective Order, (Filing No. 126 ), and his Reply in Support of his Motion to Compel Discovery, (Filing No. 118 ), shall be filed on or before July 9, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
June 30, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel 118 and Defendant BNSF's Motion for Protective Order 126 . To facilitate an in camera inspection, on or before July 9, 2014, BNSF shall deliver a compact disc containing the do cuments listed in its privilege log to the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge. BNSF shall use optical character recognition software on the documents, and save them on the compact disc, with bookmarks, in the order they are listed in the privilege log. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
August 4, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - 1) The defendant's motion to seal, (Filing No. 141 ), is granted in part. The documents filed as filing 145 and its attachments shall be filed as restricted access documents.2) The clerk shall change the security settings for Filing 145 and its attachments accordingly, and as to that filing, regenerate the Notice of Electronic Filing to counsel for all parties. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
August 17, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion for Leave to file an amended complaint and to continue the Rule 26(f) deadline. Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/10/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
August 31, 2014 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 118 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion for Protective Order; granting 142 Motion to Continue; granting 160 Motion for Hearing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
September 2, 2014 168 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Jury Trial of this case is set for 3/9/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Judge John M. Gerrard. The Pretrial Conference is set for 2/24/2015 at 11:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
October 30, 2014 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Court accepts the parties' stipulation and grants the motion to dismiss (filing 190 ). Plaintiff's claims against Andersons are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
November 4, 2014 193 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Madden's objection 174 is sustained in part and overruled in part, as set forth in this order. The Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order 167 is modified as follows: a. In addition to the documents which BNSF was previously ordered by the Magistrate Judge to produce, BNSF shall produce the following bates-stamped pages of the documents identified in pages 1 through 15 of its privilege log: BNSFCXF0003334and BNSFCXF000167. b. The following documents must also be produced, albeit in a redacted form: BNSFCXF0001516, BNSFCXF0002831, and BNSFCXF00038. The Court has attached redacted versions of these documents to this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JSF)
November 21, 2014 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1) The parties' joint stipulation, (Filing No. 212 ), is approved and the deposition of Mike Kiel may proceed in accordance with the terms set forth in that stipulation.2) The railroad's objection to the plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Issue a Subpoena to Mike Kiel, (Filing No. 211 ), is overruled as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
December 19, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Withdraw filed by Stephen L. Ahl, Krista M. Carlson and the law firm of Wolfe,Snowden, Hurd, Luers & Ahl, LLP, as counsel of record for AV Transportation, Inc. and Anton Antonov. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
December 27, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - After conferring with the parties during a conference call held today:1) To potentially facilitate moving forward on this case, the plaintiff and defendant BNSF shall promptly pursue filing notice of this lawsuit and their respective claims against the Gramercy insured, Anton Antonov and AV Transportation, Inc., in the Texas receivership forum.2) The plaintiff's claim against defendant, The Andersons, Inc., is not an action against a Gramercy insured (i.e. Ant on Antonov and AV Transportation, Inc.). Accordingly, the stay imposed by the Texas order has no impact on the pending and fully submitted motion to dismiss filed by The Andersons, Inc., (Filing No. 25 ), and the court will proceed with resolving th at motion.3) Discovery addressed as stated.4) The telephonic conference previously set for February 19, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. is re-scheduled and will be held on February 6, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. to discuss the status of proceeding against Gr amercy insured, Anton Antonov and AV Transportation, Inc., further case progression deadlines, and potential settlement. The court will email conferencing instructions for participation in the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
December 27, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Order 47 . Pursuant to the notice of receivership and injunction filed herein, (Filing No. 37 ), as to any claims filed by or against Gramercy insureds, Anton Antonov and AV Transportation, Inc., this case (including any deadlines for answering or otherwise responding to claims or cross-claims) is stayed pending further order of the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
March 8, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Court accepts the parties' stipulation (filing 58 ). Plaintiff's claims against The Andersons are dismissed, without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (AOA)
August 19, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Antonov's motion to dismiss or strike (filing 61 ) is granted in part and denied in part: a. Antonov's motion to strike is denied in its entirety. Antonov's motion to dismiss is granted in part: BNSF is not entitled to an award of attorney fees incurred prosecuting its cross-claim as an element of damages under the tort-of-another doctrine. The remainder of Antonov's motion to dismiss is denied. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (GJG)
September 12, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. This case is stayed pending further order of the court.Any motion to lift the stay or for other affirmative relief shall be filed on or before October 28, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madden v. Antonov et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald D. Madden
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Chod
Represented By: Donald F. D'Antuono
Represented By: Patrick S. O'Brien
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anton Antonov
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AV Transportation, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]