Ludlow v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Kirk J. Ludlow
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv03113
Filed: June 8, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER amending pretrial conference order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
October 29, 2013 112 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motions in limine (filings 101 , 102 , 103 , 106 ) shall be held in abeyance and not considered until the first day of trial during the pretrial conference which will be held in chambers immediately prior to trial, unless a party shall show cause, within two working days of this order, why such deferral would be inappropriate. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
November 4, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Filing 99 , Defendant's motion for witness sequestration, is granted. Filing 101 , Defendant's motion in limine regarding Frederick Martinez, is granted. Filing 102 , Defendant's motion in limine regarding the impact on P laintiff's family, is granted. Filing 103 , Defendant's motion in limine regarding Berkshire Hathaway, is granted. Filing 106 , Plaintiff's motion in limine, is denied without prejudice to reassertion at trial. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
July 13, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Protective Order Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
November 14, 2013 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Clerk shall withhold judgment. On or before Friday, December 13, 2013, the plaintiff shall file an application, supporting brief and index of evidence if the plaintiff seeks attorney fees and nontaxable costs. On or before Monday, J anuary 13, 2014, the defendant may reply to the application, brief and index of evidence submitted by the plaintiff seeking attorney fees and nontaxable costs. Counsel are advised to consult and follow NECivR 54.3 and 54.4. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
January 13, 2014 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 162 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall have until January 27, 2014, to file a reply regarding its renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law, etc. (filing 153 ). Defendant shall have until February 3, 2014, to respond to Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees and costs (filing 155 ). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
February 4, 2014 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 167 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall have until 2/17/14 to respond to Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees and costs 155 . Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
May 2, 2014 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motion to withdraw filed by Joshua P. Wunderlich as counsel of record on behalf of Kirk J. Ludlow, (filing no. 176 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
May 22, 2014 178 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees (filing 155 ) is granted in part and denied in part, as follows: a. Plaintiff is awarded a reasonable attorney's fee in the amount of $199,638.13, plus reasonable ou t-of- pocket expenses in the amount of $22,202.16. b. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Plaintiff's supplemental motion for attorney's fees (filing 172 ) is granted in part and denied in part, as follows: a. Plaintiff is awarded a reasonable attorney's fee in the amount of $6,876.00. b. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Final judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG, )
January 24, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion to Continue. The discovery deadline is extended to April 5, 2013. All other unexpired deadlines, including the pretrial conference and trial date, are continued pending the telephonic conference scheduled for February 5, 2013 at 9:00 CST. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
May 15, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANT BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - The Defendant BNSF Railway Companys Unopposed Motion for Extension of time to File, Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 70 , is granted and the defendant shall have on or before May 28, 2013, to file and serve its reply brief in support of its motion for summary judgment. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (GJG)
July 24, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - BNSF Railway Company's Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 62 , is granted in part. As explained in the memorandum accompanying this order, BNSF is entitled to summary j udgment on Count II of the complaint insofar as it is based on the theory that Ludlow was terminated in violation of public policy for reporting a coworkers forgery. In all other respects, the motion for summary judgment is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (GJG)
October 7, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant's objections to Plaintiff's designations of videotaped deposition testimony filings 82 , 83 , 84 , 85 , 86 , 87 , 88 , 89 , 90 , and 91 are denied without prejudice to reassertion at the time of trial. Plaintiff's objections to Defendant's pretrial disclosures (filing 92 ) are denied without prejudice to reassertion at the time of trial. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
October 9, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Joint Motion in Limine Regarding Unresolved Objections to the Parties Designations of Deposition Testimony (Filing 96 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion at the time of trial. The court shall rule on the parties' objections as the video depositions are played in court. Counsel are encouraged to exercise discretion in editing the video depositions to remove those portions that are obviously objectionable. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ludlow v. BNSF Railway Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk J. Ludlow
Represented By: Kyle J. Long
Represented By: Robert G. Pahlke
Represented By: Joshua P. Wunderlich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Andrew D. Ringel
Represented By: Thomas L. Beam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]