Fritchie v. United States of America

Defendant: United States of America
Plaintiff: Patricia R. Fritchie
Case Number: 4:2012cv03114
Filed: June 8, 2012
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Extend. Non-Jury Trial set for 11/18/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Pretrial Conference s et for 11/5/2013 at 09:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Telephone Conference set for 8/12/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
May 8, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Extend Progression Deadlines. Non-Jury Trial set for 1/13/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Pretrial Conference set for 12/31/2013 at 09:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. Telephone Conference set for 10/8/2013 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
August 20, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Extend. Non-Jury Trial set for 3/3/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Pretrial Confer ence set for 2/18/2014 at 11:00 AM by WebEx before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. Telephone Conference set for 11/5/2013 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. No additional extensions will be granted absent a substantial showing of good cause. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
March 5, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Complaint 1 filed by Patricia R. Fritchie. The plaintiff has failed to meet her burden of proving the defendant's negligence caused the plaintiff's accident and injuries. Judgment will be entered in favor of the defendant and against the plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fritchie v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia R. Fritchie
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bloom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]