In re: Karen J. Anthony

Trustee: U.S. Trustee and Kathleen A. Laughlin
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Creditor: Edenton North Home Owner's Association and Cattle National Bank & Trust Company
Debtor: Karen J. Anthony
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv03124
Filed: June 18, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2012 12 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Clerk of the Court shall add, as parties to each of these appeals, the creditors listed above. The Clerk of the Court shall provide notice to those parties of the previous filings in these appeals. The Clerk of the Court shall provide notice to all parties of the debtors "Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Stay of Order Pending Appeal of the Order on the Cattle National Bank and Trust Co.s Motion for Relief from Stay" (case no 4:12-cv-3124 filing 11 ). Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (Creditors added) (NEF's regenerated for all documents) (Notice of Filing 11 e-mailed to attorneys for creditors as directed) (TEL)
June 20, 2012 14 Featured Case ORDER that the appellant, Karen J. Anthony, shall file and serve her brief, in each of the above-captioned appeals, on or before July 6, 2012. Any appellee wishing to file and serve a response brief may do so, in any of the above-captioned appeals , on or before July 23, 2012. The appellant may file and serve a reply brief to any appellee's response brief on or before August 2, 2012. These appeals shall be ripe for disposition immediately thereafter. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
July 5, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part (7) Motion to Extend in case 4:12-cv-03125-JMG; granting in part and denying in part (16) Motion to Extend in case 4:12-cv-03124-JMG; granting in part and denying in part (7) Motion to Extend ; granting i n part and denying in part (8) Motion to Extend in case 4:12-cv-03126-JMG. The appellant, Karen J. Anthony, shall file and serve her brief, in each of the above-captioned appeals, on or before July 26, 2012. Any appellee wishing to file and serve a response brief may do so, in any of the above-captioned appeals, on or before August 13, 2012. The appellant may file and serve a reply brief to any appellee's response brief on or before August 23, 2012. These appeals shall be ripe for disposition immediately thereafter. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
September 11, 2012 25 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The orders of the bankruptcy court (No. BK11-42232 filings 201, 203, and 205) are affirmed. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
September 11, 2012 26 Featured Case JUDGMENT - In accordance with the accompanying Memorandum and Order, the orders of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska (No. BK11-42232 filings 201, 203, and 205) are affirmed. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
June 18, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER denying Motion to Stay Pending Appeal - Ordered by Judge Timothy J. Mahoney. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In re: Karen J. Anthony
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Patricia M. Fahey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Kathleen A. Laughlin
Represented By: Kathleen A. Laughlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Lincoln
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Edenton North Home Owner's Association
Represented By: Todd R. Mulliner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Cattle National Bank & Trust Company
Represented By: John M. Guthery, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Karen J. Anthony
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]