Stewart v. Skorupa et al

Defendant: Dorothy Skorupa, Barbrara Albes, Steven Damrow, Experience Work INC, Patricia Sue Hartwell, Lynn Johnson and Holly Lewis
Plaintiff: Robert R. Stewart
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv03184
Filed: August 30, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2013 23 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' Objection to Notice (Filing No. 20 ) is sustained. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Filing No. 21 ) is overruled. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
April 5, 2013 25 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's "Motion for Reconsideration for Default Judgment" (Filing No. 24 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
June 20, 2013 32 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendant's 31 Objection to Plaintiff's discovery requests is sustained. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
January 30, 2014 49 Featured Case ORDER denying 46 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 47 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
September 25, 2012 5 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Leave to proceed in forma pauperis, filing 2 , is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
November 19, 2012 6 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff' s Title VII race discrimination claims and ADA disability discrimination and retaliation claims against Defendants Dorothy Skorupa, Patricia Sue Hartwell, Holly Lewis, and Lynn Johnson may proceed and se rvice is now warranted. All other Defendants are dismissed from this matter without prejudice. The Clerk of the court shall send FOUR (4) summons forms and FOUR (4) USM-285 forms to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order; pl aintiff shall complete the forms and return to the Clerk to forward to US Marshals for service. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "March 19, 2013: Check for completion of service of summons." Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party with forms as directed)(ADB, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stewart v. Skorupa et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Skorupa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbrara Albes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Damrow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experience Work INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Sue Hartwell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Lewis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert R. Stewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]