Stingley v. Donahoe

Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe
Plaintiff: Monica L. Stingley
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv03232
Filed: November 20, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Stipulation for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
May 15, 2013 21 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER - Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (AOA)
September 6, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave and the final progression order is amended as follows: Deadlines for identifying expert witnesses to testify at the trial are: For the plaintiffs: October 1, 2013, For the defendant(s): November 1, 2013. The deadlines for complete expert disclosures, (both retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B)), and non-retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(C)), are: For the plaintiff(s): November 1, 2013, For the defendant(s): December 2, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
November 19, 2013 35 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The parties' stipulation for entry of a protective order, (Filing No. 33 ), is granted. A mutually agreed upon date and time will be reserved for Plaintiff and her counsel to visit and photograph work areas of the Hampton Post Office in Hampton, Nebraska, to investigate and photograph certain work areas of the Post Office for use in this litigation. Plaintiff and her counsel will treat the photographs and information obtained as confidential, and shall not disclose the photographs and information or use the photographs and information for any purpose other than presenting this lawsuit, without further order of the Court. Plaintiff and her counsel will not disclose any photograph or inform ation obtained from Defendant throughout this case to any third parties not directly involved with this lawsuit as a party or witness. Plaintiff and her counsel agree to destroy any such photographs and information within 60 days after completion of the litigation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
December 6, 2013 39 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 37 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Extend.1) The deadline for completing written discovery under Rules 33 through 36 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is January 10, 2014.2) The deposition deadline is January 10, 2014.3) The deadline for filing motions to exclude testimony on Daubert and related grounds is January 17, 2014.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
December 13, 2013 42 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The defendant's motion for protective order, (Filing No. 38 ), is granted. Mark Tylkowski's medical records, as requested by the plaintiff through written discovery, and the information within those re cords, shall be treated as confidential and not disclosed or used for any purpose other than presenting this lawsuit, without further order of the Court. Except as required by Federal law, Mark Tylkowski's medical records, including all copi es made, shall be returned to the medical provider or destroyed at the end of the litigation by the Plaintiff. If the records must be filed with the court for the purposes of this case, they shall be filed as restricted access documents. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stingley v. Donahoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica L. Stingley
Represented By: George H. Moyer, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]