Myers Construction, Inc. v. Antonov

Defendant: AV Transportation, Inc. and Anton Antonov, FL
Plaintiff: Myers Construction, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv03236
Filed: November 29, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2013 38 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Defendant's 31 Motion to Compel. On or before August 23, 2013, the plaintiff shall provide to the defendants a copy of the Bill of Lading for the shipment of the telehandler at issue in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
September 3, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER - On or before September 13, 2013, the parties shall file a notice with the court stating whether this case must be stayed pursuant to the insurer receivership/liquidation orders of the Texas court, along with copies of any Texas court orde rs on this issue. If the case is not stayed by the Texas orders, the parties shall contact my chambers during the week of September 16, 2013 to set a conference call for discussing further case progression. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
November 13, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER - The pretral conference and trial are continued pending further order of the court. The parties are instructed to contact the court within ten (10) days after the stay is lifted. The telephonic status conference set for November 13, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. is canceled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Myers Construction, Inc. v. Antonov
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AV Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Krista M. Carlson
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anton Antonov, FL
Represented By: Krista M. Carlson
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myers Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher P. Wickham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]