Eagle Boy v. Britten

Plaintiff: Charles R. Eagle Boy
Defendant: Fred Britten
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03010
Filed: January 11, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 4 ) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Status (Filing No. 9 ) is granted to the extent it is consistent with this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Telephonically (Filing No. 5 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
July 3, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's claims for monetary relief against Defendant in his official capacity are dismissed. Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim for injunctive relief against Warden Britten in his official capacity may proceed t o service. To obtain service of process on Defendant, Plaintiff must complete and return the summons form that the Clerk of the court will provide. The Clerk of the court shall send one summons form and one USM-285 form to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the Clerk of the court. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. The Clerk of the Court is di rected to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: October 25, 2013: Check for completion of service of summons. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party with one summons and one USM-285 form)(GJG)
May 29, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Eagle Boy's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
February 20, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (filing no. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $53.99 by March 20, 2013, unless an enlargement of time is granted in re sponse to a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional mo nthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's in stitution. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 20, 2013: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Eagle Boy v. Britten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R. Eagle Boy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Britten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]