Torres-Link v. TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD

Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD and TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Andrea Torres-Link
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03011
Filed: January 11, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 21 Stipulation for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
August 5, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The jury trial of this case is set to commence before Richard G. Kopf, Senior United States District Judge, in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on January 27, 2014, or as soon thereafte r as the case may be called, for a duration of five (5) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. Jury selection will be held at the commencement of trial. The in-chambers conference set for 8:30 a.m. on the first day of trial is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
September 17, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the case progression schedule is modified as follows: 1) The jury trial of this case is set to commence before Richard G. Kopf, Senior United States District Judge, in Courtroom 1, United States Courthous e, Lincoln, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on March 17, 2014, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of five (5) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. Jury selection will be held at the commencement of trial. 2) The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on March 4, 2014 at 1:00 p.m., and will be conducted by WebEx conferen cing. To facilitate this conferencing method, the parties proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, in either Word Perfect or Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on March 3, 2014. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. 3) The deadline for filing a motion to dismiss or for summary judgment is extended to November 27, 2013. 4) The deadline for filing a motion to compel is extended to October 15, 2013. 5) All other deadlines in the courts prior progression order remain in effect. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
January 27, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for final disposition. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Torres-Link v. TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Represented By: Larry J. Rappoport
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Torres-Link
Represented By: James C. Zalewski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]