Perry v. Lancaster County Nebraska

Defendant: Lancaster County Nebraska
Plaintiff: Precious Perry
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03013
Filed: January 16, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Continue. --Jury Trial set for 2/18/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Robert V. Denney Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, NE before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. --Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2014 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
December 19, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Substitute Evidentiary Materials Filed in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing 23 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall: (a) strike and seal what is now Filings 18-10, 18-11, and 18-1 2; (b) file Filing 23-3 as Filing 18-58; (c) file Filing 18-11 as Filing 18-59; and (d) file Filing 18-12 as Filing 18-60. Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Brief Date in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summar y Judgment (Filing 25 ) is granted, and Plaintiff's brief shall be filed on or before December 30, 2013. Defendant may file a reply to Plaintiff's brief on or before January 6, 2014, after which Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing 17 ) shall be ripe for disposition. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Zwart to determine whether the pretrial conference and the trial in this matter should be continued. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
December 20, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The pretrial conference and trial are continued until further order of the court. The parties shall contact the undersigned magistrate's chambers within ten (10) days after the ruling on the summary judgment to discuss the future progression of the case, if needed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
April 8, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motion to withdraw filed by Michael E. Thew as counsel of record on behalf of Defendant County of Lancaster, (filing no. 30 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
June 9, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendant's motion for summary judgment (Filing 17 ) is granted on all of the plaintiff's claims. Judgment in favor of the defendant and against the plaintiff shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Perry v. Lancaster County Nebraska
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster County Nebraska
Represented By: Michael E. Thew
Represented By: Richard C. Grabow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precious Perry
Represented By: Joy A. Shiffermiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]