Woolman v. Southeast Community College

Plaintiff: Mr. Michael B. Woolman
Defendant: Southeast Community College
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03020
Filed: January 31, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2013 11 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 10 Motion to Dismiss. A separate order will be entered hereinaccordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
November 12, 2013 13 Featured Case STRICKEN - MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On the court's own motion, Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus naming the current warden of Petitioner's place of co nfinement as the respondent. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 12/9/2013: Deadline for the petitioner to name proper respondent. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAB) Modified on 11/12/2013 to add "stricken" text pursuant to Order 14 . (JAB)
March 26, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER - Leave to proceed in forma pauperis 3 is provisionally granted, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party) (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Woolman v. Southeast Community College
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Michael B. Woolman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Community College
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]