Aupperle v. Lincoln Public Schools

Plaintiff: Renee Aupperle
Defendant: Lincoln Public Schools
Case Number: 4:2013cv03021
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The jury trial of this case is set to commence before Richard G. Kopf, Senior United States District Judge, in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on March 24, 2014, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of three (3) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. Jury selection will be held at the commencement of trial. The in-chambers conference set for 8:30 a.m. on the first day of trial is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
September 3, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
December 3, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: On or before January 2, 2014, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal, or other dispositive stipulation, together with submitting to the undersigned judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of the Court shall set a dismissal papers deadline of January 2, 2014. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aupperle v. Lincoln Public Schools
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Aupperle
Represented By: James C. Zalewski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Public Schools
Represented By: Jeanette L. Stull
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]