Woolman v. Valentino's Employee's & Family

Defendant: Valentino's Employee's & Family
Plaintiff: Mr. Michael B. Woolman
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03025
Filed: February 5, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal (filing no. 10 ) is granted and this matter is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order (filing no. 1 ) is denied as moot. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
March 6, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting 3 the Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (MKR)
March 12, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Plaintiff shall have until April 15, 2013, to amend his Complaint and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against Defendants in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amende d complaint, Plaintiffs claims against Defendants will be dismissed without further notice. In the event that Plaintiff files an amended complaint, Plaintiff shall restate the allegations of the current Complaint (filing no. 1 ) and any new all egations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 4/15/2013: Check for amended complaint on April 15, 2013.) Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Woolman v. Valentino's Employee's & Family
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valentino's Employee's & Family
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Michael B. Woolman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]