Gray v. Nebraska Department of Correctional Services et al

Defendant: Robin Spindler, Robert Houston, Mr. Busboom, Frank X. Hopkins, Francis Britten, Shawn Sherman, Michelle Hillman, Pam Hillman, Nebraska Department of Correctional Services and Larry Wayane
Plaintiff: Graylin Gray
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03026
Filed: February 6, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 11 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- Plaintiff has failed to state an Eighth Amendment claim upon which relief may be granted. On the court's own motion, he shall have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to file an amended complaint in accorda nce with this Memorandum and Order. Any amended complaint must restate the allegations of the current complaint and any new allegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or if Plaintiffs allegations are not sufficient, this matter will be dismissed without further notice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/2/2013: Check for amended complaint on August 2, 2013) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
September 18, 2013 14 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -The court's previous Memorandum and Order granting Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 7 ) is stricken, and Plaintiff Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) rem ains pending. Plaintiff has until October 18, 2013, to either show cause why he is entitled to proceed IFP pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(g) or pay the court's $400.00 filing and administrative fees. In the absence of either action by P laintiff, this matter will be dismissed without further notice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 10/18/2013: Deadline forPlaintiff to show cause or pay full filing fee) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
November 5, 2013 15 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is denied. This matter is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Filing No. 12 ) is denied as moot. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
March 25, 2013 7 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (filing no. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $.20 by April 25, 2013, unless an enlargemen t of time is granted in response to a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiffs institution shall collect t he additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Pl aintiff's institution. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 25, 2013: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times, and all parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the court's Local Rules while this case is pending. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Filing No. 4 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed and to pro se party)(TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gray v. Nebraska Department of Correctional Services et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Spindler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Busboom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank X. Hopkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Britten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Sherman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Hillman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Hillman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Wayane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graylin Gray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]