United Rentals, Inc. v. Reynolds

Plaintiff: United Rentals, Inc.
Interested Party: Nebraska Machinery Company
Defendant: Jeff Reynolds
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03029
Filed: February 7, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - United Rentals' Motion for Expedited Briefing and Consideration, (Filing No. 4 ) is granted and Nebraska Machinery Co.'s Objection, (Filing No. 13 ) is overruled as follows: 1) Nebraska Machinery Company shall s ubmit its brief in response to United Rentals' Motion to Compel on or before February 19, 2013. No reply brief shall be filed absent leave of the court. 2) The parties shall participate in a telephonic hearing on February 21, 2013 at 1:00 p.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. The hearing will be placed on the record so that the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut may access the audio file through the PACER service. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
February 26, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding initial stages of imaging and forensic examination of all electronic storage media issued or provided by NMC for use by defendant Jeff Reynolds.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl) Modified on 2/26/2013 to confirm copies mails to out-state counsel by CRZ (Zwart, Cheryl).
April 2, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: On or before May 2, 2013, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal, or other dispositive stipulation, together with submitting to the undersigned judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Ab sent compliance with this order, this case may be dismissed without further notice. All pending motions are held in abeyance until May 2, 2013, pending filing of the above-reference stipulation. The Clerk of the Court shall set a dismissal papers deadline of May 2, 2013. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United Rentals, Inc. v. Reynolds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce E. Samuels
Represented By: Tara A. Stingley
Represented By: Milton A. Wagner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Machinery Company
Represented By: David A. Yudelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Reynolds
Represented By: Christopher L. Brigham
Represented By: Leilani M. Harbeck
Represented By: Margaret C. Hershiser
Represented By: Angel Peterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]