Woolman v. Ward of Lancaster County et al

Plaintiff: Michael B. Woolman
Defendant: Cedars Ward of Adoptions and Ward of Lancaster County
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03036
Filed: February 19, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 10 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until July 26, 2013, to amend his Complaint to clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against Defendants in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended c omplaint, Plaintiffs claims against Defendants will be dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all timeswhile this case is pending. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without furthernotice. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/26/2013: Check for amended complaint on July26, 2013) Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
October 11, 2013 14 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order.Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
October 28, 2013 23 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's 22 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis is granted. Plaintiff's two miscellaneous motions filed on October 22, 2013, 17 MOTION to Compel and MOTION 18 are denied because they are frivolous and nonsensical. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party and Court of Appeals as directed)(MKR)
March 26, 2013 9 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting the Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy e-mailed to pro se party)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Woolman v. Ward of Lancaster County et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael B. Woolman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedars Ward of Adoptions
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward of Lancaster County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]