State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Interline Brands, Inc. et al

Defendant: Linx Ltd., Interline Brands, Inc. and Watts Water Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03037
Filed: February 20, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
 
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON WATTS WATER TECHNOLOGIES' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION - IT IS ORDERED that Watts Water Technologies' motion to dismiss, (ECF No. 11 ), is denied. For docket management purposes, the clerk of the court may consider State Farm's objection to Watts Water Technologies' motion to dismiss, (ECF No. 16 ), to be sustained; the objection should no longer appear on the docket sheet as a separate pending motion. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (TCL )
July 3, 2013 28 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED that: State Farm's motion to dismiss, (ECF No. 25 ), is granted in part. State Farm's claims agains t Interline Brands, Inc. and Linx Ltd. are dismissed without prejudice, subject to the condition set forth in the memorandum accompanying this order. Interline Brands, Inc.'s and Linx Ltd.'s motion for summary judgment, (ECF No. 22 ), is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (TCL )
August 2, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER - The Unopposed Motion to Extend Time in Which to Respond to Motion to Reconsider Filed by Defendant, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., ECF No. 38 , is granted and the plaintiff shall have on or before August 16, 2013, to file and serve its response. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (AOA)
August 27, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER granting 41 Unopposed Motion for Brief Extension. The defendant, Watts Water Technologies, shall have on or before August 28, 2013, in which to file and serve its brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
September 9, 2013 45 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Interline's and Linx's application for attorney's fees and expenses, (ECF No. 29 ), is granted in part. State Farm may not refile its claims against either Interline or Linx without first paying at total sum of $5,872 to these defendants. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (AOA)
September 18, 2013 46 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Watts Water Technologies' motion for reconsideration, (ECF No. 30), is denied as moot. Watts Water Technologies' amended motion for reconsideration, (ECF No. 32 ), is denied. Watts Water Technologies' requ est for a hearing, (ECF No. 32 ), is granted in part. A hearing will be held on the question of personal jurisdiction. Within fourteen days of the date of this order: a) the parties must submit a proposed order that includes an agreed-upon hearing date and, if necessary, a proposed expedited discovery schedule; or b) if the parties cannot reach an agreement on these matters, State Farm must file a motion for a hearing. This motion may also include a request for expedited discovery on the issue of personal jurisdiction. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (AOA)
October 7, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER that the Joint Stipulated Motion and Order addressing the personal juriisdiction issue existing is to be submitted to this court on or before October 11, 2013.Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Interline Brands, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linx Ltd.
Represented By: Julie A. Martin
Represented By: Brian D. Nolan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interline Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D. Nolan
Represented By: Julie A. Martin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Water Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jerald L. Rauterkus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]