United States of America v. $8,189.00 in United States Currency

Defendant: $8,189.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03038
Filed: February 20, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER FOR PROGRESSION OF CIVIL FORFEITURE CASE granting 23 Motion to Extend Progression Order Deadlines. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JSF)
March 21, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Withdraw Joshua Barber as Attorney. Mr. Barber shall immediately mail copies of this Order, by certified mail, to Mr. Salinas and thereafter file proof of service showing compliance with this Order, listing the names a nd addresses of the persons to whom notice was sent. Mr. Barber will not be relieved of applicable duties to the Court, Mr. Salinas and opposing counsel until proof of service is filed. Upon the filing of proof of service pursuant to Paragraph 2 of this Order, Mr. Salinas will be deemed to be proceeding pro se, that is, without the assistance of counsel, unless substitute counsel has entered a written appearance on his behalf. Upon Mr. Barber's submission of proof of service as described in Paragraph 2 of this Order, the Clerk of Court shall terminate Mr. Barber's appearance as counsel for Mr. Salinas and cease further notices to him in this matter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
July 17, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -The Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. 31 ) entered on June 18, 2014, by United States Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett are adopted in their entirety; Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Claim (Filing No. 29 ) is granted; The Clai m (Filing No. 12 ) and Answer (Filing No. 13 ), filed by Claimant John Salinas, are stricken; and A separate default judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order will be entered in favor of the Plaintiff as against Claimant John Salinas. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. $8,189.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,189.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nancy A. Svoboda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]