Douglass v. Manor of Lincoln, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Staci Douglass
Defendant: Manor of Lincoln, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv03039
Filed: February 22, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Protective Order Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
October 10, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the defendants' unopposed motion to amend the final progression schedule, (Filing No. 32 ), is granted as follows: The dispositive motion deadline is extended to January 14, 2014. The Pretrial Conference is schedu led to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on April 1, 2014 at 9:00 a.m., and will be conducted by WebEx conferencing. The jury trial of this case is set to commence before John M. Gerrard, United States District Judge, in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on April 15, 2014, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of three (3) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. Jury selection will be held at the commencement of trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
October 25, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The motion to withdraw filed by Kathleen M. Neary and the firm of Vincent M. Powers as attorneys of record for the plaintiff, Staci Douglass, (filing no. 36 ), is granted. On or before November 14, 2013, Pla intiff Staci Douglass shall either: (a) obtain the services of counsel and have that attorney file an appearance in this case; or (b) file a statement notifying the court of her intent to litigate this case without the assistance of counsel. The f ailure to do so may result in a dismissal of Plaintiff's claims without further notice. Kathleen M. Neary and the firm of Vincent M. Powers shall promptly mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff Staci Douglass, and file a certificate of service stating the date, manner, and address of service. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )
October 26, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Consistent with the notice filed by the plaintiff's former counsel, (Filing No. 40 ), the clerk shall modify the docket to reflect plaintiff Staci Douglass' address as 1802 Harwood, Lincoln, Nebraska 68502. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
November 4, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: On the court's own motion, the telephonic conference scheduled for November 5, 2013 is continued pending a ruling on plaintiff's representation. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order on the pro se plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
November 18, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff Staci Douglass is given until December 9, 2013 to show cause why the court should not dismiss Plaintiff's claims for want of prosecution without further notice. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff Staci Douglass at 1802 Harwood, Lincoln, Nebraska 68502. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
December 30, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting 45 the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation and Order. This case is dismissed. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglass v. Manor of Lincoln, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci Douglass
Represented By: Kathleen M. Neary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manor of Lincoln, Inc.
Represented By: Mary L. Hewitt
Represented By: Robert L. Lepp
Represented By: Mathew T. Watson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]