Brown v. Astrue

Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Plaintiff: Caylin Thomas Brown
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03042
Filed: February 28, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time. The defendant shall on or before September 5, 2013, file and serve its response brief; within one week after the defendant's response brief is filed and served, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief and either party may request oral argument or make any other request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and in the absence of an order setting the case for oral argument or scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
September 9, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF - IT THEREFORE IS ORDERED that: 1. the Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief, ECF No. 18, is granted; 2. the defendant shall have on or before October 7, 2013, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff's brief; 3. within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file an d serve a reply brief ; 4. the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof; and 5. the clerk of court shall substitute Carolyn W. Colvin as Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(d). Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (TCL )
March 24, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Commissioner of Social Security's decision is affirmed. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (AOA)
March 25, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON APPLICATION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, ECF No. 2 , is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caylin Thomas Brown
Represented By: James E. Schneider
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]