Ross v. Houston

Petitioner: Michael L. Ross
Respondent: Robert Houston
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03043
Filed: March 4, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2013 15 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Respondent's Motion to Extend (filing no. 14 ) is granted in accordance with this Memorandum and Order and is otherwise denied. Respondent is directed to file a reply by October 23, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
March 25, 2013 7 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner will not be required to pay the $5 fee at this time. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
May 14, 2013 8 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition (filing no. 1 ) to Respondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By June 27, 2013, Respondent shal l file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 27, 2013: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 26, 2013: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (filing no. 3 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ross v. Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael L. Ross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]