Beckett v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Barbara Kay Beckett
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2013cv03057
Filed: March 12, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Brief, ECF No. 21 , is granted. The defendant shall have on or before October 9, 2013, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff&# 039;s brief. Within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief. The case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (AOA)
April 7, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Commissioner of Social Security's decision is affirmed. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (AOA)
March 18, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (filing 2 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall file the original complaint and the accompanying pleadings without the prepayment of costs or fees. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beckett v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Kay Beckett
Represented By: James E. Schneider
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]