Meijers v. People's Health Center

Defendant: People's Health Center and DDS Reddy
Plaintiff: Jeff Meijers
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03064
Filed: March 20, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel. On or before June 13, 2013, Plaintiff Meijers shall either: (a) obtain the services of counsel and have that attorney file an appearance in this case; or (b) file a statement notifying the court of his intent to litigate this case without the assistance of counsel. The failure to do so may result in a dismissal of Plaintiff's claims without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
June 24, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff Meijers' claims be dismissed for want of prosecution. The parties are notified that failing to file an objection to this recommendation as provided in the local rules of this court may be held to be a waiver of any right to appeal the court's adoption of the recommendation. The clerk shall mail a copy of this recommendation to Plaintiff at the address of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed as directed) (JSF)
June 26, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' motion to substitute the United States as defendant is granted. The United States shall be substituted for the named defendants. Defen dants' motion to dismiss is granted. Meijer's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. However, Meijers may file an amended complaint on or before July 26, 2013. If Meijers fails to file an amended complaint by that time, this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. Defendants' motion to consolidate is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Meijers v. People's Health Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People's Health Center
Represented By: Paul D. Boeshart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDS Reddy
Represented By: Paul D. Boeshart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Meijers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]