Peterson v. Wolvin

Defendant: US Attorney Deborah R. Gilg, US Attorney General Eric H. Holder , Jr. and Carolyn W Wolvin
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Robert C Peterson
Case Number: 4:2013cv03080
Filed: April 11, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for enlargement of time (filing 14 ) is granted, and the briefing schedule is modified as follows: 1. Plaintiff shall file a brief by August 19, 2013; 2. Defendant shall file a brief by September 18, 2013; 3. Plaintiff may file a reply brief by October 2, 2013; and 4. This case shall be ripe for decision on October 3, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
September 18, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant's (second) motion for extension of time (filing 18 ) is granted, and the briefing schedule is modified as follows: 1. Defendant shall file a brief by October 18, 2013; 2. Plaintiff may file a reply brief by November 1, 2013; and 3. This case shall be ripe for decision on November 4, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
October 18, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant's (second) motion for extension of time (filing 20 ) is granted, and the briefing schedule is modified as follows: Defendant shall file a brief by November 18, 2013. Plaintiff may file a reply brief by December 2, 2013. This case shall be ripe for decision on December 3, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
November 18, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant's (third) motion for extension of time (filing 22 ) is granted, and the briefing schedule is modified as follows:1. Defendant shall file a brief by December 18, 2013;2. Plaintiff may file a reply brief by January 10, 2014; and3. This case shall be ripe for decision on January 13, 2014. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)
February 5, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Complaint 1 filed by Robert C. Peterson. The decision of the Commissioner is affirmed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Final judgment will be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
April 12, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (filing 2 ) is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall file the original complaint and the accompanying pleadings without the prepayment of costs or fees. The Clerk of the Court shall i ssue summon upon Carolyn W. Wolvin, Commissioner of the Social Security; Eric J. Holder, United States Attorney General; and Deborah R. Gilg, United States Attorney for the District of Nebraska, and return such summonses to plaintiff's counsel for service on the individuals named therein pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 4. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Wolvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney Deborah R. Gilg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General Eric H. Holder , Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Wolvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Peterson
Represented By: Sophia M. Alvarez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]