McGee v. Houston

Respondent: Robert Houston
Petitioner: Eric McGee
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03084
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion for Reconsideration. The clerk's office is directed to reopen this matter. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JLS, )
December 18, 2013 12 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - McGhee's Petition is dismissed without prejudice to reassertion of a subsequent petition upon authorization by the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. The court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
May 31, 2013 7 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Eric McGee shall pay the filing fee of $5.00 by 6/28/13. Petitioner is warned that if the fee is not paid as required, the court may dismiss this case w ithout further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 28, 2013: deadline for Petitioner to pay $5.00 filing fee; and No further review of this case will take place until the filing fee is paid. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
September 4, 2013 8 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this matter is dismissed without prejudice; A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order; and Petitioner's 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McGee v. Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric McGee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]