Sedano v. Colvin

Defendant: Eric H. Holder , Jr. and Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested Party: Deborah R. Gilg and Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sharon Kay Sedano
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03091
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time. The defendant shall on or before September 16, 2013, file and serve its response brief; within one week after the defendant's response brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief ; and in the absence of any other scheduling requests, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
September 17, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief. The defendant shall have on or before October 16, 2013, in which to file and serve her response to the plaintiff's brief; w ithin one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file and serve a reply brief ; and the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
May 3, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Following completion of the service and summons, the Marshal shall serve the United States, without payment of costs or fees. Service shall be effected pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i) regarding "[s]erving the United States, Its Agencies, Corporations, Officers, or Employees." That upon receipt of a certified copy of the transcript of the records, the Clerk of Court shall enter its standard briefing order in this case. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sedano v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder , Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Deborah R. Gilg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Kay Sedano
Represented By: Lori L. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]