Ildefonso v. Gage

Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Petitioner: Arlyn P. Ildefonso
Respondent: Brian Gage
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03110
Filed: June 6, 2013
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2013 10 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Ildefonso's "Motion for Leave to Use Previously Filed Attachments and Exhibits as Part of Petitioner[']s Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254" (Filing No. [7) is granted, but only to the extent it is consistent with this memorandum and order. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
October 22, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER denying 9 Motion for Issuance of Extraordinary Writ.Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(EJL)
December 17, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER denying 16 Motion for Appointment of Counsel without prejudice t reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(EJL)
January 8, 2014 18 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing No. 13 ), I preliminarily determine that Ildefonso's 81 claims are potentially cognizable in federal court. The clerk's office is di rected to mail copies of this memorandum and order and the amended petition (Filing No. 13 ) to the respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By February 21, 2014, the respondent shall file a motion for summa ryjudgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 21, 2014: deadline for the respondent to file state court r ecords in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copies mailed as directed)(AOA) Modified on 1/29/2014 to reflect this 1/8/14 order was discovered not docketed on 1/27/14 and was then uploaded to the system on 1/27/14 but being filed as of 1/8/14 (CCB).
June 12, 2013 5 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (filing no. 2 ) is provisionally granted and Ildefonso will not be required to pay the $5.00 fee at this time. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
September 9, 2013 6 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Ildefonso will have 60 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus that presents his claims for relief together with the facts in support of those claims. Failure to f ile an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus may result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: November 8, 2013: deadline for Ildefonso to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. The clerk's office is directed to send to Ildefonso the Form AO 241, Petition for Relief From a Conviction or Sentence By a Person in State Custody. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy with form mailed to pro se party) (AOA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ildefonso v. Gage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arlyn P. Ildefonso
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Gage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]