Lovette v. Houston et al

Petitioner: Marvin Walker Lovette
Respondent: Robert P. Houston and Brian Gage
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
 
Case Number: 4:2014cv03056
Filed: March 19, 2014
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2014 7 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Petitioner's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Marvin Walker Lovette shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $5.00 by May 26, 2014. Petitioner is warned that if the fee is no t paid as required, the court may dismiss this case without further notice. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/26/2014 (deadline for Petitioner to pay $5.00 filing fee). Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
April 21, 2014 8 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Clerk's office is directed to strike from the docket sheet the court's Memorandum and Order dated April 15, 2014 7 . Petition may be disregard the court's order dated April 15, 2014, directing him to pay the filing fee. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
June 24, 2014 9 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioners claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. The Clerk o f the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By August 8, 2014, Respondent shall file a motion for summaryjudgment or state court rec ords in support of an answer. If Respondent elects to file a motion for summary judgment, the procedure set forth within the order shall be followed by Respondent. If Respondent elects to file an answer, the procedures set forth within the order shall be followed by Respondent and Petitioner. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 8, 2014: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 8/8/2014: deadline for Respondent to file state courtrecords in support of answer or motion for summary judgment.) Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed as directed)(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lovette v. Houston et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvin Walker Lovette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert P. Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Gage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Jon C. Bruning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]