Perez v. MWE Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: United States Department of Labor and Thomas E. Perez
Defendant: MWE Services, Inc., Katie Cederburg and John Zapata
Case Number: 4:2014cv03073
Filed: April 4, 2014
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendants Katie Cederburg and MWE Services, Inc.'s motion for extension of time (filing [11\) is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett (AOA) Modified on 6/12/2014 to correct text entry language (AOA).
June 13, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant John Zapata's Motion to Compel (filing 14 ) and Motion for Hearing (filing 15 ) are denied without prejudice to reassertion at an appropriate time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (AOA)
August 11, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Zapata's Motion for Leave to Amend his Answer (Filing No. 21 ) is granted. Zapata should re-file his Amended Answer on or before August 15, 2014. Zapata's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 13 ) is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (GJG)
December 3, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Immigration Status (filing 40 ) is granted. Defendants are barred from inquiring into immigration matters in this case, including questions regarding the immigration status of witnesses and deponents. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. MWE Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Justin H. Whitten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Represented By: Justin H. Whitten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MWE Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Cederburg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Zapata
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]