Roche Constructors, Inc. v. Lincoln County Nebraska

Plaintiff: Roche Constructors, Inc.
Defendant: Lincoln County, Nebraska
 
Case Number: 7:2012cv05011
Filed: November 9, 2012
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 7 North Platte Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2013 29 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 28 Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Clawback Agreement). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (BJC)
August 9, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Any motions for summary judgment on the issue of the insurance claim for roof replacement shall be filed on or before September 27, 2013. A telephone conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on October 17, 2013, at 10:00 a.m., for the purpose of reviewing the preparation of the case to date and the scheduling of the case to trial. Counsel for Roche Constructors, Inc. shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
April 24, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: On or before May 26, 2014, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourt s.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this ord er, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The previously scheduled telephone conference, status report deadline, final pretrial conference, and trial are cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
May 23, 2014 72 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - IT IS ORDERED the Stipulation shall be and the same is hereby approved.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Roche Constructors, Inc. v. Lincoln County Nebraska
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roche Constructors, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick W. Kennison, Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy T. Fitzpatrick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln County, Nebraska
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]